HI HB811 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-27 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-27 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax credit for increases in the total number of covered employees and total wages paid to covered employees by a taxpayer between 2010 and 2012.
Title
Tax Credit; Employment Increase
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-27 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 01-27-11 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=811 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB811_.HTM |