HI HB812 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a tenant who is a victim of domestic violence to terminate the tenant's rental agreement. (SD1)
Title
Landlord-Tenant; Domestic Violence Victims; Cancellation of Lease
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 915) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2009-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Hemmings. | |
2009-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-19-09 9:30am in conference room 229. | |
2009-03-13 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-18-09 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2009-03-13 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-09 8:30am in conference room 229. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to CPN, JGO. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 153). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 711) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-26 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Cabanilla, Luke, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita, Souki. | |
2009-02-26 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Wakai, Cabanilla, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, Mizuno, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes, Belatti, Carroll, McKelvey, Morita, Souki. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-26-09 2:00pm in conference room 325. | |
2009-02-23 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-26-2009. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 02-23-09 2:00pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Bertram, Takai, Takumi excused (3). | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 316) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Mizuno, Brower, Belatti, Bertram, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Carroll, Shimabukuro. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-09-09 8:15 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) Re-referred to HUS, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 8 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Referred to HUS/HSG, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 3 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |