HI HB812 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Inserts new position titles within existing statutes describing the civil service status of Public Utilities Commission staff and repeals existing position staff descriptions for the Commission under Act 177, Session Laws of Hawaii 2007.
Title
Public Utilities Commission; Staffing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 390), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Evans, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-11-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-13. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-29 | House | Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1042 (Same As) 2013-06-18 - Act 104, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1204).