HI HB857 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB857
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all moped and motor scooter rental companies to ensure the rider wears a safety helmet supplied either by the rental company or by the renter prior to operating the moped or motor scooter. Exempts riders with a motorcycle license from this requirement. Prohibits the rental of any moped or motor scooter with aftermarket modifications. Amends the definition of motor scooter.
Title
Relating To Rentals Of Mopeds And Motor Scooters.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=857&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB857_.HTM |