HI HB860 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB860
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 1/1/2022, prohibits the issuance of building permits for new single-family dwellings that are part of a development of twenty or more dwellings and do not include a rooftop photovoltaic energy generating system, unless a variance is granted. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Rooftop Solar Installation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-02 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB860 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
New Residential Construction Requirement
Rooftop Photovoltaic Energy Generating Systems
Rooftop Solar Installation
Rooftop Photovoltaic Energy Generating Systems
Rooftop Solar Installation