HI HB866 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to THA/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Tourism and Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to THA/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Tourism and Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies counties' ownership of and responsibility for certain existing sewer systems and facilities servicing Hawaiian Home Lands. Requires the counties to accept dedication or license of and responsibility for certain other sewer systems and facilities servicing Hawaiian Home Lands. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB866 HD2)
Title
Sewer Systems Servicing; Hawaiian Home Lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to THA/PSM, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 297). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 752) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-15 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale. |
2013-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-15-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 304) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to OMH. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-13 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-13. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 01-28-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, OMH, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1097 (Same As) 2013-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.