HI HB909 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB909
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a two-year water neutrality turf replacement pilot program in the county of Maui department of water supply to provide financial incentives to replace irrigated turf with turf or other plants that use less water. Requires a report to the legislature by 11/1/2025. Appropriates funds. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Water Conservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 185) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ECD. |
2023-02-02 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-02-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB909 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=909&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB909_HD1_.HTM |