HI HB915 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Act 003, 4/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Act 003, 4/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits noncharging of an employer's account when the employer (or agent) is at fault and imposes a fifteen per cent penalty on fraudulent benefit overpayments effective October 1, 2013; provides for deductions from federal income tax refunds to recover delinquent debts effective April 1, 2013; and allows the withdrawal of fees from the unemployment trust fund effective April 1, 2013
Title
Employment Security Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Act 003, 4/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103). |
2013-04-03 | House | Act 003, on 4/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103). |
2013-03-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-03-27 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 408). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-27-13. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1055) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-13 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 116). |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 695), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 90), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1146 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to JDL, WAM.