HI HB920 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Labor and Industrial Relations Appeals Board to establish a $30 fee for the filing of appeals and fees for other administrative expenses. Establishes a Labor and Industrial Relations Appeals Board Special Fund. Effective July 1, 2013. Repealed July 1, 2016. (HB920 HD1)
Title
Labor and Industrial Relations Appeals Board; Special Fund ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-14-13 2:45PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cachola, Say excused (2). |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 145) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1151 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to JDL, WAM.