HI HB936 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that no public entity or public employee shall be liable to any person for injury or damage sustained on government land when engaged in mountain climbing, rock climbing, rappelling, and bouldering.
Title
Limited Liability; Government Land; Mountain Climbing, Rock Climbing, Rappelling, and Bouldering
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-28 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 01-28-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1167 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=936&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB936_.htm |