HI HB936 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-02 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-02 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the Hawaii Public Housing Authority's authority to dispose of property seized, abandoned, or remaining in federal, elder or elderly, or state low-income housing projects, including property remaining upon eviction.
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Disposition of Property Abandoned, Seized, or Remaining at Federal and State Public Housing Properties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-02-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1105 (Same As) 2015-01-28 - Referred to HSH/JDL, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=936&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB936_.HTM |