HI HB941 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB941
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the State Chief Operating Officer to assist the Governor in developing and recommending policies beneficial to businesses and to increase economic development.
Title
Relating To A State Chief Operating Officer.
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Diamond Garcia [R] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Elijah Pierick [R] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB941 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=941&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB941_.HTM |