HI HB947 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB947
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides authority for the Hawaii Criminal Justice Data Center to set and collect fees for services provided as long as the fees are reasonable and not constitute a barrier to justice. (HB947 HD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaii Criminal Justice Data Center Fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5). |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 343) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Thielen. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-19. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB947 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
SB1174 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1174 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.