HI HB954 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB954
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that lands set aside to the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation by the Governor or leased to the Corporation by other State departments and agencies are exempt from the definition of "public lands."
Title
Relating To Public Lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB954 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1181 (Same As) 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to WTL/HOU/GVO, WAM.
SB1181 (Same As) 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to WTL/HOU/GVO, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=954&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB954_.HTM |