HI HB960 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB960
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires eligible affordable housing projects in community development districts to engage in formal consultation with the Hawaii Community Development Authority.
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing Projects In Community Development Districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1187 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB960 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB960 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=960&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB960_.HTM |