HI HB966 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB966
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning on 1/1/2024, permits manufacturers of investigational drugs or biological products to make these drugs and products available to terminally ill patients under certain conditions. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Access To Treatment For Terminally Ill Patients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4). |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 199-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-07-24 9:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB857 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB966 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB966 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3