HI HB971 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB971
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for an expedited agency hearing for any criminal activity that threatens the health and safety of the community or any drug-related criminal activity.
Title
Relating To The Expedited Agency Hearing.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1125 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB971 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB971 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=971&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB971_.HTM |