HI HCR104 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR104
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing The Support Of The State Of Hawaii For The Rights Of The Indigenous People Of North Dakota To Preserve Their Cultural Heritage And Access To Clean Water.
Title
Expressing The Support Of The State Of Hawaii For The Rights Of The Indigenous People Of North Dakota To Preserve Their Cultural Heritage And Access To Clean Water.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 644). |
2017-05-02 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tupola excused (2). |
2017-05-02 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2017-04-24 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 702) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-24-17. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1696) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-17 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to IAA/JDL. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 381). |
2017-03-29 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-29 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakashima, Onishi, Oshiro, Say, Thielen, Todd excused (7). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1541), recommending adoption. |
2017-03-23 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Oshiro. |
2017-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-23-17 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 29 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
2017-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR104 (Carry Over) 2017-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR62 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR62 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.