HI HCR104 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR104
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to TRS/PSM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to TRS/PSM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating Kailua, Oahu, As A Vision Zero Community Where No Loss Of Life Or Serious Injury On Roads Is Acceptable And Urging Government To Adopt And Implement Vision Zero Policies And Planning.
Title
Designating Kailua, Oahu, As A Vision Zero Community Where No Loss Of Life Or Serious Injury On Roads Is Acceptable And Urging Government To Adopt And Implement Vision Zero Policies And Planning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 525). |
2019-04-02 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-02 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (4). |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1943), recommending adoption. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Yamane. |
2019-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR104 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Referred to TRS/PSM.
HR98 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR98 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=104&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR104_.HTM |