HI HCR141 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting the application of Hawaiian Airlines to the United States Department of Transportation to provide air transportation service to Haneda Airport, Tokyo, Japan.
Title
Supporting the application of Hawaiian Airlines to the United States Department of Transportation to provide air transportation service to Haneda Airport, Tokyo, Japan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-13 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 578). | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) One Day Notice 04-13-10. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Reported from TSM/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3139) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Galuteria, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2010-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-08-10 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Referred to TSM/TIA. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 295). | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Takai, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1080-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Awana, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Rhoads, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Saiki, Pine. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-29-10 10:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Re-referred to TRN, referral sheet 54 | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Referred to TCI/TRN, referral sheet 39 | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-03 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR81 (Same As) 2010-03-30 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.