HI HCR141 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the development of an action plan to mitigate immediate and future critical shortages of physicians in the State of Hawaii.
Title
Urging the development of an action plan to mitigate immediate and future critical shortages of physicians in the State of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HRE, WAM. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 474). |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1464-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308. |
2014-03-24 | House | Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2014-03-20 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Souki, Takai, Wooley excused (4). |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1098-14), recommending referral to HED. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Oshiro. |
2014-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-19-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, HED, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=141&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HCR141_.HTM |