HI HCR15 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on ERB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on ERB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Study To Determine Ways, Other Than Tax Incentives, To Encourage Employers To Provide And Pay For Long Term Care Insurance And Individuals To Purchase Long Term Care Insurance.
Title
Kupuna Caucus; Long Term Care Insurance; Evaluation; Auditor
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on ERB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (5). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1086-12), recommending referral to ERB. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Wooley, Ching, Pine. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-24-12 9:15AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Referred to HLT, ERB, FIN, referral sheet 9 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Offered | |
2012-01-23 | (H) To be offered. |