HI HCR170 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR170
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing And Supporting The Positive Economic Impact Of Foreign Direct Investment To The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Recognizing And Supporting The Positive Economic Impact Of Foreign Direct Investment To The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1469), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-22-17 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR170 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=170&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR170_.HTM |