HI HCR174 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Conduct A Study On The Implementation Of Later School Start Times.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Conduct A Study On The Implementation Of Later School Start Times.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 491). |
2024-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-01 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan excused (2). |
2024-04-01 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1572-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd. |
2024-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-21-24 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to EDN, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Subjects
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Transportation
DOE
Later Start Times
Public Elementary School
Public High School
Public Middle School
Report
Department of Transportation
DOE
Later Start Times
Public Elementary School
Public High School
Public Middle School
Report