HI HCR180 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on EDN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on EDN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Support The Reauthorization Of The Native Hawaiian Education Act.
Title
Native Hawaiian Education Act; Congressional Support
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on EDN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll excused. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1375) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to EDN. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Mizuno, Pine. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-23-11 8:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Referred to HAW, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 40 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered | |
2011-03-15 | (H) To be offered. |