HI HCR182 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to WTL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to WTL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Land And Natural Resources To Offer Leases Of Public Land Located In Kokee State Park Through A Public Lottery System.
Title
Kokee State Park; Leases; Lottery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to WTL. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 505). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1281-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman, Keith-Agaran, Finnegan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 57 | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 45 | |
2010-03-09 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-08 | (H) To be offered. |