HI HCR187 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 753) in amended form (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 753) in amended form (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study On Best Practices For Nurse Staffing In Health Care Facilities.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study On Best Practices For Nurse Staffing In Health Care Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 753) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-24. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3910) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Awa. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS deferred the measure until 04-17-24 8:45AM; Conference Room 225. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to HHS. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 638). |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1644-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2024-03-28 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1536-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2024-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR167 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.