HI HCR199 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Consider Certain Factors Before Entering Into Contracts With Managed Care Organizations That Provide Medicaid Benefits Under Quest Managed Care Plans.
Title
Medicaid benefits; QUEST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-29 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 663). | |
2010-04-29 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) One Day Notice 04-29-10. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3238) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 04-19-10 1:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-10 8:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to HMS. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 509). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1286-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan, Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 45 | |
2010-03-09 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-08 | (H) To be offered. |