HI HCR203 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation And Its Regional Boards To Submit Plans And Recommendations For Reducing Its Operating Deficits.
Title
Concerning the need to reduce the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation's operating deficits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 488). |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1479-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308. |
2014-03-20 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Souki, Takai, Wooley excused (4). |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1095-14), recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2014-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-19-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR160 (Same As) 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=203&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HCR203_.HTM |