HI HCR216 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing Support For Hawaii To Pursue The Bid To Host The 2016 International Union For Conservation Of Nature World Conservation Congress.
Title
International Union for Conservation of Nature World Conservation Congress
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 638). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) One Day Notice 04-23-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from ENE/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3222) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Slom. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Hooser; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-10 10:45AM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to ENE/TIA. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 514). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1282-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 59 | |
2010-03-11 | (H) Referred to TCI/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 47 | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-09 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR145 (Same As) 2010-04-06 - (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 59