HI HCR232 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - (S) Referred to TIA/JDL.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - (S) Referred to TIA/JDL.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting The Review And Consideration Of The Human Rights Recommendations From The 2010 United Nations Universal Periodic Review Of The United States Of America.
Title
Human Rights; United Nations Universal Periodic Review
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | (S) Referred to TIA/JDL. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 635). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from INT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1725) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Yamane, Ching. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on INT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Awana, Hashem, Brower, Evans, McKelvey, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Ward. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by INT/HUS on Wednesday, 04-13-11 2:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to INT/HUS, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |