HI HCR273 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The School Of Travel Industry Management At The University Of Hawaii At Manoa To Develop Enhancements For The Tourism-related Capabilities Of The University Of Hawaii Economic Research Organization Data Portal.
Title
UH School of Travel Industry Management
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-05-02 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 691). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) One Day Notice 04-29-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from TSM/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1405) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kouchi, Galuteria, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Recommitted to TSM/EDU. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) The committee on TSM/EDU will reconsider its previous decision on HCR273 and will hold a public decision making on 04-27-11 3:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) One Day Notice 04-26-11. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Reported from TSM/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1344) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kouchi, Galuteria, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Nishihara. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-11 1:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Referred to TSM/EDU. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 383). | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Carroll excused. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1409), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Brower, Tokioka, Choy, Hashem, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Awana, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Ching. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Re-referred to HED, TOU, referral sheet 51 | |
2011-03-31 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 04-04-11 11:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on TOU with none voting no and Har, M. Oshiro excused. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1234), recommending referral to TOU. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Belatti, Chang, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 03-24-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to HED, TOU, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR240 (Same As) 2011-04-05 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.