HI HCR289 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting State Public Entities To Commit To Healthier And More Nutritious Meals In Their Programs By Spending More Of Their Food Dollars For Locally-produced Produce Or Other Hawaii Agricultural Products.
Title
State Agencies; Food Money Spending on Locally-Produced Food
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 642). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) One Day Notice 04-23-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from WTL/JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3223) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Bunda, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine, Slom. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Bunda, Fukunaga, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Takamine, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL/JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-10 1:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to WTL/JGO. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 525). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1344-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Belatti, Berg, Chang, Mizuno, M. Oshiro, Shimabukuro, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 951-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Wooley, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Takai, Tokioka, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan, Wakai. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-19-10 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 49 | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
SCR181 (Same As) 2010-03-15 - (S) Referred to WTL/JGO, WAM.