HI HCR319 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to HMS/WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to HMS/WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Management And Financial Audit Of All Community-based Programs And Services Receiving Medicaid Funding Or Subsidizing Individuals Eligible For Medicaid.
Title
Audit; Medicaid Funds
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to HMS/WAM. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 553). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Belatti, Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Deferred one day 04-09-10. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1249-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Tokioka, B. Oshiro, Chong, Evans, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by LMG on Monday, 04-05-10 3:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting no and Bertram, Herkes, M. Lee, Mizuno excused. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1009-10), recommending referral to LMG. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Belatti, Carroll, Shimabukuro, Finnegan. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Mizuno, Brower, Bertram, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Belatti, Carroll, Shimabukuro, Ward. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Thursday, 03-18-10 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Referred to HUS/HLT, LMG, referral sheet 49 | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR234 (Same As) 2010-04-05 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.