HI HCR36 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Judiciary To Convene A Task Force To Recommend Uniform Practices Regarding Body And Dash Camera Implementation Within Hawaii Law Enforcement Statewide.
Title
Task Force to Recommend Uniform Practices For Body and Dash Camera Implementation within Hawaii Law Enforcement
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1419-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Kawakami, Morikawa, Woodson. |
2016-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-24-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2016-02-05 | House | Offered |
2016-02-04 | House | To be offered. |