HI HCR45 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - (H) The committee(s) on LMG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - (H) The committee(s) on LMG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Sunrise Review Of The Regulation Of Plumber Air Conditioning And Refrigeration Pipefitters, Plumber Fire Sprinkler Pipefitters, And Plumber Solar-thermal Technicians.
Title
Plumber Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Pipefitters; Plumber Fire Sprinkler Pipefitters; Plumber Solar-Thermal Technicians
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | (H) The committee(s) on LMG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by LMG on Wednesday, 04-11-12 9:35AM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on LMG as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4). | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1457-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to LMG. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Keith-Agaran, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Ching. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-29-12 2:40PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-02-22 | (H) The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-12 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Referred to CPC, LMG, referral sheet 24 | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Offered | |
2012-02-08 | (H) To be offered. |