HI HCR45 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Extend The No Parking Restriction On Isenberg Street Between South King Street And Young Street From 5:30 P.m. To 6:30 P.m.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Extend The No Parking Restriction On Isenberg Street Between South King Street And Young Street From 5:30 P.m. To 6:30 P.m.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateReferred to TRS.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 602).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2044), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
2019-04-01HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1827), recommending referral to JUD.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen.
2019-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-07HouseOffered
2019-03-06HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR42 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback