HI HCR94 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Board Of Education And Department Of Education, In Collaboration With The Department Of Health, To Develop And Adopt Guidelines For The Training Of School Employees And Qualified Volunteers To Provide Care To Students With Diabetes.
Title
Board of Education; Department of Education; Diabetes Training
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to HLT, EDN, referral sheet 37 |
2013-03-12 | House | Offered |
2013-03-11 | House | To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=94&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR94_.HTM |