HI HR121 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing And Commending The United States-indonesia Comprehensive Partnership And The Global Significance Of Enhanced Cooperation Between The United States And Indonesia.
Title
United States-Indonesia Comprehensive Partnership; Commendation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla excused (1). |
2013-04-03 | House | Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 49 |
2013-04-01 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, McKelvey excused (2). |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1294), recommending referral to EDB. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ohno, McDermott. |
2013-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-27-13 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to VMI, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR152 (Same As) 2013-04-09 - Referred to TIA.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=121&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR121_.HTM |