HI HR136 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The United States Postal Service To Issue A Commemorative Postage Stamp In Honor Of Alfred Aholo Apaka.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The United States Postal Service To Issue A Commemorative Postage Stamp In Honor Of Alfred Aholo Apaka.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-22HouseAdopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1).
2019-04-22HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2300) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
2019-04-18HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott.
2019-04-16HouseScheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1737), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-03-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:15AM in conference room 312.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HCR149 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback