HI HR146 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Complete A Study On Possible Revenue Generating Activities At Sand Island.
Title
Requesting the Legislative Reference Bureau to Complete a Study on Possible Revenue Generation at Sand Island Park.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | House | Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 47 |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to WAL, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR181 (Same As) 2013-04-18 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=146&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR146_.HTM |