HI HR148 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The President Of The United States And Congress To Support And Pass The Filipino Veterans Family Reunification Act Of 2013.
Title
Veterans; Filipino Family Member Reunification; Congress
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-01 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1). |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1306), recommending adoption. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ohno, McDermott. |
2013-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-27-13 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to VMI, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR183 (Same As) 2013-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=148&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR148_.HTM |