HI HR149 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The City And County Of Honolulu To Complete The Implementation Of Salt Lake District Park Master Plan.
Title
Salt Lake District Park Master Plan; Completion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, M. Oshiro excused. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1753), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Chong, Riviere. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-25-11 9:45AM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Re-referred to WLO, referral sheet 53 | |
2011-04-01 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 04-01-11 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 40 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered | |
2011-03-15 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR172 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - (H) Re-referred to WLO, referral sheet 53
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=149 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR149_.HTM |