HI HR44 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Proclaim July 13, 2012, As "collector Car Appreciation Day".
Title
Collector Car Appreciation Day; July 13, 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Manahan excused (2). | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1349-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, Yamashita, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Johanson. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-21-12 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Referred to TRN, referral sheet 38 | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Offered | |
2012-02-23 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR63 (Same As) 2012-04-02 - (S) Referred to TIA.