HI SB100 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:15AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:15AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Corrects a statement in the 2014 Act that reduced the appropriation for the joint investment study of the employees' retirement system and Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund. (SB100 HD1)
Title
Employees' Retirement System, Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund Joint Investment Study; 2014 Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:15AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 11:15AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Tupola. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 477). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1592), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-04-07 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-04-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-08-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1026) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-20-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 54) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 730) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |