HI SB1000 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a cable operator to disclose the maximum bandwidth available and a statement that outside factors may affect the actual bandwidth received for cable communication services. (SD1)
Title
Technology; Cable Communication Service; Bandwidth; Disclosures
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 90) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from EET/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2668) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Espero, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ruderman. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-29-16 2:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-29-16 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/CPH. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee on EDT deferred the measure. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDT, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |