HI SB1003 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 265, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1368).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Chief Information Officer to conduct or cause to be conducted security audits, which may include reviews of physical security practices, of all executive branch agencies regarding the protection of government information and data communication infrastructure and to direct remedial actions as necessary. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chief Information Officer; Information Technology; Security

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 265, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1368).
2013-07-09HouseAct 265, on 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1368).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 84) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 84).
2013-04-24HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Takayama, Choy; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2013-04-24SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2013-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 712).
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Chun Oakland added as Co-Chair(s).
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Ige discharged as Co-Chair(s).
2013-04-18SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2013-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Tsuji, Takayama Co-Chairs; Choy, Ward.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Wakai, Chair; Nishihara, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Keith-Agaran, Slom.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 584).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Har, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
2013-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1519) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson.
2013-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 3:15PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-19HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-03-19HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1004), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-03-15HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-15-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 270) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi.
2013-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-02-14SenateReported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 264) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom.
2013-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 1:15PM in conference room 414.
2013-01-24SenateRe-Referred to TEC, WAM.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to TEC.
2013-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB767 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback