HI SB101 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 107, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 107, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the preparation of hand-pounded poi from certain Department of Health (DOH) requirements regarding food safety if certain conditions are met. Requires the DOH to adopt rules no later than December 31, 2011. (CD1)
Title
Hand-pounded Poi; Exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | (S) Act 107, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210). | |
2011-06-16 | (H) Act 107, on 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Hee. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 10). | |
2011-04-26 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Yamane, Herkes, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Wooley. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-11 1:35PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Hanohano, Yamane, Herkes Co-Chairs; C. Lee, Wooley, Ward. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Re-referred to HAW, HLT, CPC, referral sheet 60 | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 604). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Deferred until 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 399). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Saiki, Takumi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-08-11. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1429) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-28-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Re-referred to HAW, CPC, referral sheet 42 | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting no (0) and Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Wooley excused (6). | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 994) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Jordan, Morikawa, Wooley, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno, Yamane. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-02-11 9:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Referred to HAW, HLT, CPC, referral sheet 18 | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 9) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Kim). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 02-10-11. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 43) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 01-31-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Referred to HTH. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |