HI SB101 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates required increases to an agency's budget for the agency's implementation of energy efficiency retrofitting through performance contracting.
Title
Energy Conservation; Public Facilities; Energy Efficiency Retrofitting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-19-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 77). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 748) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 347) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to ENE, WAM. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |