HI SB101 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 118, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1218).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 118, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1218).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends allocations from the Hawaii Tobacco Settlement Special Fund. Repeals tobacco settlement funds as the means of financing for certain health and human services programs. Appropriates general fund revenues to various health and human services programs formerly supported by Hawaii Tobacco Settlement funds. (CD1)
Title
Hawaii Tobacco Settlement Special Fund; Budget; MSA; Tobacco Settlement
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Act 118, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1218). |
2015-06-16 | House | Act 118, on 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1218). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Say voting no (3) and Representative(s) Tsuji excused (1). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 154) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 154). |
2015-04-30 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Johanson, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-27-15 3:05PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Johanson, Pouha. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 478). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Oshiro voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1533) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15. |
2015-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-31 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 3:30PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 55) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 559) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |